Suchak, Nayana Avinash (CPSO#: 70429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Towne Centre Medical Clinic
Suite 201
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone: (905) 604-3336
Fax: (905) 604-7750
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nayana A. Suchak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Suchak ( CPSO# 70429 )

Business Address:
Towne Centre Medical Clinic
201 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone Number: (905) 604-3336

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5159

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAYANA AVINASH SUCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUCHAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998