Sud, Shelly (CPSO#: 83514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hôpital de Gatineau - Cancerologie
909 Boul. La Verendrye
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Phone: 819-966-8038
Fax: 819-966-6264
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shelly Sud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sud ( CPSO# 83514 )

Business Address:
909 Boul La Verendrye O.
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Phone Number: (819) 966-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLY SUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005