Sue, Sammy Cheong Wah (CPSO#: 84709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sammy Sue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sue ( CPSO# 84709 )
Dr. L. Doucet ( CPSO# 86725 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMMY CHEONG WAH SUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008