Suess, Christine Josephine (CPSO#: 75549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Illinois, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Montreal Road
Cornwall ON  K6H 1B1
Phone: (613) 936-9130
Fax: (613) 936-9727
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Suess Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Suess ( CPSO# 75549 )

Business Address:
10 Montreal Road
Cornwall ON  K6H 1B1
Phone Number: (613) 936-9130

Business Address:
Suite 202
4 Montreal Road
Cornwall ON  K6H 1B1
Phone Number: (613) 936-9130

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JOSEPHINE SUESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUESS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001