Suh, Matthew Chung Kuee (CPSO#: 31835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1994

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Seoul National University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
436 Gilmour Street
Suite 201
Ottawa ON  K2P 0R8
Phone: (613) 234-7573
Fax: (613) 744-8528
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Suh & Dr. Susan C. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Suh ( CPSO# 31835 )
Dr. S. Smith ( CPSO# 21091 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
436 Gilmour Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 0R8
Phone Number: (613) 234-7573

Business Address:
Suite 202
436 Gilmour Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 0R8
Phone Number: (613) 232-9513

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW CHUNG KUEE SUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Suh’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Suh engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct during his care and treatment of this patient.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Third Party Records Motion: January 30, 2018 Hearing Dates: April 16 to 20 and April 23, 2018