Suhadolc, Thomas George (CPSO#: 52118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: Suhadolic, Thomas George (used until: 29 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main St E
Grimsby, ON
L3M1P3
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: (905)945-2253
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tom Suhadolc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Suhadolc ( CPSO# 52118 )

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS GEORGE SUHADOLC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUHADOLC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 29 Mar 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Mar 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1983