Suleman, Shiraz (CPSO#: 73341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bramalea Medical Centre
Suite 207
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 792-5027
Fax: (905) 792-0631
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shiraz Suleman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Suleman ( CPSO# 73341 )

Business Address:
Bramalea Medical Centre
207 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 792-5027

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRAZ SULEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 1999 to 17 Oct 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1999