Suszek, John Jeffrey Gerard (CPSO#: 68166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5858
Fax: (519) 751-5570
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

238 Grandriver Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Canada
Phone: (519) 442-2251
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

95 Darling Street
Brantford ON  N3T 2K7
Canada
Phone: (519) 720-0712
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Suszek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Suszek ( CPSO# 68166 )

Business Address:
7 - 121 Matheson Street South
Kenora ON  P9N 3X7
Phone Number: (807) 467-3103

Business Address:
95 Darling Street
Brantford ON  N3T 2K7
Phone Number: (519) 720-0712

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5507

Business Address:
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Phone Number: (519) 442-2251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JEFFREY GERARD SUSZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUSZEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996