Sutherland, William Edward (CPSO#: 88543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. William Sutherland
Orchard Park
Suite 341
5420 Hwy 6 North
Guelph ON  N1H 6J2
Phone: (519) 829-2323
Fax: (519) 829-2329
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William E. Sutherland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Sutherland ( CPSO# 88543 )

Business Address:
Orchard Park Office Centre
Unit 341
5420 Highway 6 North
Guelph ON  N1H 6J2
Phone Number: (519) 829-2323

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM EDWARD SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012