Svoboda, Tomislav (CPSO#: 69424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seaton House
Annex Harm Reduction Program
339 George Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2N2
Phone: (416) 397-5598
Fax: (416) 392-5587
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Art Manuel House
2437 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M9W 3X9
Canada
Phone: (647) 342-0400
Fax: (647) 342-7350
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Stephen's Community House
The Corner Drop In
260 Augusta Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 964-8747 Ext. 2262
Fax: (416) 966-2178
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Stephen's Community House
Toronto Community Addiction Team
260 Augusta Ave
Toronto ON  M5T 2L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 353-4431
Fax: (416) 966-2178
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 31 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMISLAV SVOBODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SVOBODA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1997