Swain, Gordon Jerome (CPSO#: 71600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Cancer Care W4968
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 740-8326
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon J. Swain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Swain ( CPSO# 71600 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Cancer Care
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7730

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 740-8326

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON JEROME SWAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2001