Syed, Khalid Ali (CPSO#: 73567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
E W 1 446
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5281
Fax: 8883779331
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

130 Adelaide St. West
Toronto ON  M5H 3P5
Canada
Phone: 4166035281
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1106 - 4789 Yonge St
North York ON  M2N 0G3
Canada
Phone: (416) 792-1022
Fax: 8886127157
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khalid Syed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hussain ( CPSO# 78646 )
Dr. K. Syed ( CPSO# 73567 )

Business Address:
130 Adelaide Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 3P5
Phone Number: (416) 603-5281

Business Address:
1106 - 4789 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 0G3

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite EW1-446
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID ALI SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004