Sylvester, Heather Anne (CPSO#: 57094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: Macdonald, Heather Anne (used until: 18 Nov 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Special Services Unit
Stratford General Hospital
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y9
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2563
Fax: (519) 272-8226
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Sylvester Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sylvester ( CPSO# 57094 )

Business Address:
Special Services Unit
Stratford General Hospital
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone Number: (519) 272-8246

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE SYLVESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYLVESTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2001 to 15 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1988