Syty-Golda, Maria Barbara (CPSO#: 52110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
432 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1J9
Phone: (905) 529-2423
Fax: (905) 522-2600
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Syty-Golda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Syty-Golda ( CPSO# 52110 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
432 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1J9
Phone Number: (905) 529-2423

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA BARBARA SYTY-GOLDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYTY-GOLDA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 28 Feb 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 28 Feb 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009