Szpejda, Monika Agnieszka (CPSO#: 56008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Vine Street
Suite 206
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: (905) 682-0122
Fax: (905) 682-1429
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monika Szpejda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Szpejda ( CPSO# 56008 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
180 Vine Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 682-0122

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIKA AGNIESZKA SZPEJDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZPEJDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989