Szymczak, Peter Sebastian (CPSO#: 87028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
160 David Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2L3
Phone: (519) 787-1800
Fax: (519) 787-2015
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Szymczak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Szymczak ( CPSO# 87028 )
Dr. E. Talikowska-Szymczak ( CPSO# 100509)

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9

Business Address:
160 St. David Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 787-1800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER SEBASTIAN SZYMCZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZYMCZAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 09 Dec 2010 to 08 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 09 Dec 2011 to 08 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2014