Tabah, Roger John (CPSO#: 43586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MUHC - Cedars Cancer Center
Room D.02.7324
1001 Decarie
Montreal QC  H3G 3J1
Phone: (514) 932-4224
Fax: (514) 9387695
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1650 Cedar Ave
Montreal QC  H3G 1A4
Canada
Phone: 514-9341934 Ext. 44337
Fax: 514-938-7695
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER JOHN TABAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992