Tainsh, Susan Mary Miller (CPSO#: 52069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rubidge Retirement Residence
270 Rubidge Street
Peterborough,ON
K9J3P2
Peterborough ON  K9J 7Y0
Phone: (705) 748 4000
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Tainsh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tainsh ( CPSO# 52069 )

Business Address:
Rubidge Retirement Home
246 - 270 Rubidge Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 3P2
Phone Number: (705) 748-4000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY MILLER TAINSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAINSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1985