Tallmadge, Caroline (CPSO#: 56966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 14576
Fax: (613) 798-5554
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Tallmadge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tallmadge ( CPSO# 56966 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room 306
Department of Anaesthesia
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Critical Care Wing
501 Smyth Road
Suite 1401
Ottawa ON  K1H 5L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
207 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 729-3179

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE TALLMADGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALLMADGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2002 to 09 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1987