Tam, Stanley Sun-Kun (CPSO#: 52009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1983


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 Chipstead Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3E5
Phone: (416) 816-9810
Fax: (416) 391-4597
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stanley S. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2006

Dr. S. Tam ( CPSO# 52009 )

Business Address:
3 Chipstead Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3E5
Phone Number: (416) 391-4597

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. STANLEY SUN-KUN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1983