Tan, King Wi Andre (CPSO#: 67382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Nov 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
307A Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 3V3
Phone: (613) 409-8888
Fax: (613) 409-8889
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lennox & Addington County Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tan ( CPSO# 67382 )

Business Address:
Lennox and Addington County Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Unit 3
307A Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 3V3
Phone Number: (613) 409-8888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 7, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 1, 2010, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. King Wi Andre Tan's privileges for the care of paediatric patients were temporarily suspended, effective September 1, 2010.

On September 7, 2010, Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston notified the College that Dr. King W.A. Tan's privileges for the care of paediatric ENT patients were temporarily suspended, effective September 7, 2010. On October 27, 2010, Dr. Tan's elective paediatric privileges were restored with supervision and monitoring.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 14, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. King Wi Andre Tan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tan to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Tan will limit his practice to a community-based ENT practice in a
                  non-tertiary setting; will limit the procedures he performs under general
                  anaesthetic to the procedures included in the list attached as Schedule
                  "A"; and has voluntarily agreed not to have on-call responsibilities at
                  any clinic or hospital.
                  
             SCHEDULE "A" TO THE UNDERTAKING OF DR. KING WI ANDRE TAN
             TO THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND  SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
             General       Septoplasty
             Anesthesia
                           Rhinoplasty +/- nasal valve reconstruction
                           Turbinate Reduction
                           Nasal Mass Biopsy
                           Septal Perforation Repair
                           Septodermal Grafting
                           Myringoplasty
                           Tympanoplasty
                           Myringotomy and Tubes
                           Foreign Body Removal of Nose
                           Foreign Body Removal of Ears
                           Micro-laryngoscopy and Biopsy
                           Submandibular Gland Exercision
                           Removal of Salivary Stone
                           Neck Node Biopsy
                           Uvuloplasty (UPPP)
                           Tonsillectomy and / or Adenoidectomy
                           Routine/Pre-planned  tracheostomy  in  chronically  ventilated
                           patients
                           Minor Oral Lesion Removal or Biopsy
                           Endoscopic Sinus Surgery
             MAC           Facial Skin Lesion Resection
                           Facial Defect Reconstruction (include grafts and local flaps)
                           Facial Scar Revision