Tan, Lee Puan (CPSO#: 22995)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. P. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 1407 Ottawa Street Windsor, ON N8X 2G1
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015