Tanaka, Yumi (CPSO#: 98611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 9058831212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Tanaka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Tanaka ( CPSO# 98611 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
101 - 9401 Jane Street
Building A
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUMI TANAKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANAKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2015 to 27 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015