Tang, Alexander Wing Leung (CPSO#: 29274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Cumberland Clinic
162 Cumberland St
Suite 225
Toronoto, ON M5R 3N5
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Rice Cosmetic Surgery
1333 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 345
Toironto, ON M2J 1V1
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tang ( CPSO# 29274 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6002

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5R 1N5

Business Address:
The Cumberland Clinic
The Renaissance Court
162 Cumberland Street
Suite 225
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5

Business Address:
Rice Cosmetic Surgery
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER WING LEUNG TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1992