Tang, Joanna Wing-See (CPSO#: 90878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanna W.S. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tang ( CPSO# 90878 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 844-3281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA WING-SEE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011