Taremi, Mojgan (CPSO#: 79749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Iranian

Education:University of Tehran, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6595
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-2121
Fax: (416) 946-4586
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mojgan Taremi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taremi ( CPSO# 79749 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
3rd Floor
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOJGAN TAREMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAREMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2009