Tattersall, Philippa Jill (CPSO#: 59356)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. J. Tattersall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Station Ganges PO Box 216 Salt Spring Island, British Columbia V8K 2V9
Date Received: 26 Jun 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2013