Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Taub, Sherry Joy (CPSO#: 58960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9555 Yonge Street
Suite 309
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M5
Phone: (905) 508-3422
Fax: (905) 508-7025
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sherry Taub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Taub ( CPSO# 58960 )

Business Address:
309 - 9555 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M5
Phone Number: (905) 508-3422

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERRY JOY TAUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAUB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987