Tawadros, Patrick (CPSO#: 77991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Surgical Associates
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone: (905) 820-3633
Fax: (905) 820-3352
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Tawadros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tawadros ( CPSO# 77991 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Surgical Associates
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone Number: (905) 820-3633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK TAWADROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAWADROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012