Taylor, John Grant (CPSO#: 53571)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universidad Del Noreste, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grant Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017