Taylor, Taryn-Lise (CPSO#: 80775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton Sport Medicine Clinic
The Ice House
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Fax: (613) 520-3974
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taryn Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Taylor ( CPSO# 80775 )

Business Address:
Carleton Sport Medicine Clinic
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-3510

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARYN-LISE TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006