Teitelbaum, Earl Jeffrey (CPSO#: 54062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 180
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 633-1780
Fax: (416) 633-6530
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Earl J. Teitelbaum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Teitelbaum ( CPSO# 54062 )

Business Address:
Suite 180
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 633-1780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EARL JEFFREY TEITELBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEITELBAUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1986