Ten Hove, Martin William (CPSO#: 60709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3390
Fax: (613) 546-2731
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.W. Ten Hove Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ten Hove ( CPSO# 60709 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 484-1088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 11 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN WILLIAM TEN HOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEN HOVE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1990