Teoh, Kevin Hong To (CPSO#: 51997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 836-4600
Fax: (905) 868-8371
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin H. T. Teoh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Teoh ( CPSO# 51997 )

Business Address:
30 Prospect Street
Suite 100
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 836-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN HONG TO TEOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEOH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1985