Teresi, James Emmanuel (CPSO#: 69261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Rm 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
3 E N - 437
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 3L4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-5164
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Eye Institute
340 College St., Suite 600
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James E. Teresi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Teresi ( CPSO# 69261 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
19-104 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES EMMANUEL TERESI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERESI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000