Thacker, Kenneth Eldon James (CPSO#: 67927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
TBRHSC
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 6846000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Thacker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Thacker ( CPSO# 67927 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ELDON JAMES THACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THACKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1996