Theodorou, Maria Eugenia (CPSO#: 73759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care Corporation
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-5511
Fax: (613) 766-4661
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria E. Theodorou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Theodorou ( CPSO# 73759 )

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-5511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA EUGENIA THEODOROU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEODOROU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2004