Thipphavong, Seng (CPSO#: 80701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
Medical Imaging
Room 2238
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B5
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Seng Thipphavong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thipphavong ( CPSO# 80701 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
2nd Floor, Suite 2238
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6113

Business Address:
Suite 562, 5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918, 3rd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SENG THIPPHAVONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIPPHAVONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2009