Thirlwell, Celeste Jean (CPSO#: 76629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Sleep and
Chronobioogy
295 CollegeSt #310
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Phone: 416 603 9531
Fax: 416 603 2388
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cobourg Sleep Clinic
197 Third St
K9A 3L5
Toronto ON  K9A 3L5
Canada
Phone: 905 373 1227
Fax: 905 373 4062
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

411 Horner Ave. #1
Etobicoke ON  M8W 4W3
Canada
Phone: 416 251-1055
Fax: 416 251-2446
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

226 Bathurst Street #300
Toronto ON  M5T 2R9
Canada
Phone: 416 749-5556
Fax: 416 749-0361
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sleep Disorders Clinic of The
Centre for Sleep & Chronobiology
Unit 15
951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 2A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 746-3012
Fax: 416 746 7016
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3077 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M6A 1Z9
Canada
Phone: 416 782-7772
Fax: 416 782-6664
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Celeste J. Thirlwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thirlwell ( CPSO# 76629 )

Business Address:
300 - 226 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2R9
Phone Number: (647) 527-8740

Business Address:
301 - 295 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Phone Number: (416) 603-9531

Business Address:
2352 Yonge Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4P 2E6
Phone Number: (877) 321-0854

Business Address:
1 - 411 Horner Road
Etobicoke ON  M8W 2B2
Phone Number: (416) 251-2446

Business Address:
Suite 15
951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 746-3012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CELESTE JEAN THIRLWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRLWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Feb 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2013