Thomas, Danielle Anne (CPSO#: 54450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

36 Madison Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2S1
Canada
Phone: (416) 705-1905
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle A. Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thomas ( CPSO# 54450 )

Business Address:
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 978-8073

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE ANNE THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1986