Thomas, Jacqueline Ann (CPSO#: 70066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 3920
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4632
Fax: (416) 586-5216
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thomas ( CPSO# 70066 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
OPG - Unit 3920
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4632

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANN THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001