Thomas, Michelle Lynn (CPSO#: 70254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Patterson Medical Clinic
45 Wolsely Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-3021
Fax: (807) 468-6964
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pinecrest Home for the Aged
1220 Valley Drive
Kenora ON  P9N 2W7
Canada
Phone: 807-468-3165
Fax: 807-468-6346
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Whitedog Medical Clinic
General Delivery
Whitedog ON  P0X 1P0
Canada
Phone: 807-927-2345
Fax: 807-927-2419
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Lynn Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thomas ( CPSO# 70254 )

Business Address:
Patterson Medical Clinic
45 Wolsley Street
RR 1
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3021

Business Address:
Whitedog Medical Clinic
General Delivery
Whitedog ON  P0X 1P0

Business Address:
Pinecrest Home for the Aged
1220 Valley Drive
Kenora ON  P9N 2W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3165

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LYNN THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998