Thomas, Sophia (CPSO#: 69993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand Marais Urgent Care
2930 Dominion Blvd
Windsor ON  N9E 2M2
Canada
Phone: 226-773-6260
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sophia Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thomas ( CPSO# 69993 )

Business Address:
2930 Dominion Boulevard
Windsor ON  N9E 2M2
Phone Number: (226) 773-6260

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu - Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIA THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999