Thomasson, Kathleen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 98024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
444 Douro St, 2nd Floor
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: 519-271-3123
Fax: 519-271-6760
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseh's Family Medical Centre
346 Platts Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Canada
Phone: 519-646-6000 Ext. 67268
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

444 Douro St, 2nd Florr
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Canada
Phone: 519-271-3123
Fax: 519-271-6760
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ELIZABETH THOMASSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMASSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2015