Thompson, Tracey Alexandra (CPSO#: 65898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101A
540 Boul. De L'Hopital
Gatineau QC  J8V 3T2
Phone: (819) 561-8739
Fax: (819) 561-6929
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre de Sante et de
Services Sociaux de Gatineau
Hopital de Gatineau
909 boul la Verendrye ouest
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Canada
Phone: (819) 966-6100
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 28 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACEY ALEXANDRA THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992