Thomsen, John Eric (CPSO#: 60875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B
274 Lynden Road
Brantford ON  N3R 6B8
Phone: (519) 758-8626
Fax: (519) 758-9848
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thomsen ( CPSO# 60875 )
Dr. P. Thomsen ( CPSO# 60957 )

Business Address:
Suite B - 274 Lyden Road
Brantford ON  N3R 6B8
Phone Number: (519) 758-8626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ERIC THOMSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990