Thomson, Benjamin Kervin Alan (CPSO#: 92006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division Of Nephrology
Burr 03-038
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7306
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ambulatory Clinics For
Home Hemodialysis
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (226) 678-7067
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Thomson ( CPSO# 92006 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Burr 03-038
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Ambulatory Clinics for Home Hemodialysis
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (226) 678-7067

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN KERVIN ALAN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Aug 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011