Thomson, James Graham (CPSO#: 28712)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Graham Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 3 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Southmount Medical Imaging 35 Upper Centennial Parkway Hamilton, ON L8J 3W2 Tel: 905 387 4551
Date Received: 14 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2016