Thornton, Alistair James (CPSO#: 93641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khodaei Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thornton ( CPSO# 93641 )
Dr. M. Khodaei ( CPSO# 92866 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISTAIR JAMES THORNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THORNTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015