Thow, David Philip (CPSO#: 58472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-6168
Fax: (905) 721-6605
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Thow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thow ( CPSO# 58472 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-6168

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PHILIP THOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988